Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan-Robert Caïmo

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1711³BornBruselles
20 Mar 173422.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Jun 173524.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 175342.6SelectedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
1 Apr 175442.9ConfirmedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
16 Jun 175443.1Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
22 Dec 177564.6DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan-Robert Caïmo:
Bishop Jan-Robert Caïmo (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1755
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015