Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Caccia

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635BornMilan
2 Jan 169358.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
4 Jan 169358.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
13 Apr 169358.3AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 Dec 169560.9Elevated to Cardinal
13 Aug 169661.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
14 Jan 169964.0DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Caccia:
Federico Cardinal Caccia (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
  • a cardinal for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695
  • c3+: CB, 1 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014