Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michelangelo Brancavalerio

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1617³Born
16 Mar 164729.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 164830.5AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
17 May 164830.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
25 Mar 1683³65.4DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Brancavalerio
Bishop Michelangelo Brancavalerio (born Oct 1617, died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017