Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomás de Borja

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1600AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
9 Apr 1600Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
30 Apr 1603AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
7 Sep 1610DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás de Borja
Archbishop Tomás de Borja (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 126, and Page 229
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 114, Number 723
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast