Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Maria Bichi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619²Born
1636²17.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Mar 165839.2AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
31 Mar 165839.2Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
12 Jun 167354.4AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
9 Sep 168364.6DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pier Maria Bichi (VIAF: 309733365)
Bishop Pier Maria Bichi O.S.B. (born 1619, died ) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Ordained BishopSanta Francesca Romana, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSovana, Diocese of Sovana (Soana)

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 364
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 349
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 30
  • b/c2: AT, 25 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017