Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare BiandrÓ (Biandrati)

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornAsti
5 May 166651.3AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
9 May 166651.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
26 Aug 166651.6DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare BiandrÓ (Biandrati):
Bishop Cesare BiandrÓ (Biandrati) (died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 75
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1666, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015