Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cornelio Cardinal Bentivoglio

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1668BornFerrara, Italy
28 Dec 171143.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 171243.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
3 Apr 171244.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
29 Nov 171951.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Apr 172052.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
25 Jun 172759.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
30 Dec 173264.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

MicroData Summary for Cornelio Bentivoglio:
Cornelio Cardinal Bentivoglio (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

  • a priest for 21.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
  • a cardinal for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1719
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 145
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 May 2013
  • c34: CB, 27 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 28 May 2015