Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Bentini

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1660³BornFaenza
Jan 1700³39.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Emperor
Jul 1700³39.7ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Emperor
16 Apr 171453.5AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
22 Apr 171453.5Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
3 Mar 174483.4DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bentini
Bishop Francesco Bentini (born , died ) Bishop of Comacchio

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1723
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 165
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016