Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stéphane Bello, O.A.O.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1910BornAlquosh
14 Oct 193424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Antonian Order of Saint Ormizda of the Chaldeans (Chaldean)
23 Oct 195949.1AppointedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Chaldean), Syria
10 Jan 196049.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Chaldean), Syria
26 Nov 198979.2DiedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Chaldean), Syria

MicroData Summary for Stéphane Bello:
Bishop Stéphane Bello O.A.O.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,383
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013