Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Battista Battaglini

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1646³Born
17 Apr 169044.0AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
7 May 169044.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
8 Jun 171670.2AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
19 Sep 171771.4DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Battista Battaglini
Bishop Marco Battista Battaglini (born , died ) Bishop of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRimini, Diocese of Rimini

  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 134, and Page 293
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,690, Number 39
  • ob/c2: AT, 23 May 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,418

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast