Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Barsotti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600²BornLucca
23 Apr 166363.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
23 Apr 166363.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
26 Aug 166363.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
9 Mar 166464.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Barsotti:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Barsotti (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 162
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013