Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Mercurino Arborio di Gattinara, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1685³BornLucques
9 Dec 170823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
23 Dec 172944.2AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
8 Jan 173044.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
28 Sep 174358.0DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Mercurino Arborio di Gattinara:
Bishop Giovanni Mercurino Arborio di Gattinara B. (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 77
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015