Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Archinto

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1651Born
10 Jun 168028.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jun 168028.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 170351.4AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
18 Mar 170351.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
22 Oct 171059.0DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Archinto
Bishop Girolamo Archinto (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCantý, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVigevano, Diocese of Vigevano
Buried Place (Original)San Carlo Chapel, Cathedral, Vigevano, Diocese of Vigevano

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 415
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,873
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1703, Number 5
  • ~c2: AT, 9 Aug 2020
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,599
  • c2/loc: AT, 10 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Aug 2020

Quantcast