Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Joseph IX Ragi (Youssef) El-Khazen (Gazeno)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1791¹Born
1830¹39.0AppointedBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
6 Apr 183039.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
18 Aug 184554.6SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
19 Jan 184655.0ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
3 Nov 185463.8DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph IX Ragi (Youssef) El-Khazen (Gazeno)
Patriarch Joseph IX Ragi (Youssef) El-Khazen (Gazeno) (born 1791, died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAjaltoun

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,928
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 79
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast