Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Accoramboni

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1672BornCastel de Preci
14 Feb 172350.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 172452.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
21 Sep 172452.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
12 Apr 172855.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Imola, Italy
20 Sep 172856.0Elevated to Cardinal
15 Nov 172856.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
22 Feb 173966.4ResignedBishop of Imola, Italy
11 Mar 174370.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
21 Mar 174774.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Accoramboni:
Cardinal Giuseppe Accoramboni (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a priest for 24.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
  • a cardinal for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1728
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 228, and Page 313
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013