Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul-Raphaël Abi Mourad

Deceased

Patriarchal Vicar Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine

Titular Bishop of Damiata dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1864Born
2 Jul 190036.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Damiata dei Greco-Melkiti
2 Sep 190036.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Damiata dei Greco-Melkiti
190338.9AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
191954.9ResignedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
8 Aug 193571.5DiedPatriarchal Vicar Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine

MicroData Summary for Paul-Raphaël Abi Mourad
Archbishop Paul-Raphaël Abi Mourad (born , died ) Patriarchal Vicar Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZahlé, Lebanon

  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018