Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Territorial Prelature of Schneidemühl

Praelatura Territorialis Schneidemuhlensis

Suppressed

To: Diocese of Gorzów and Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Administration of Schneidemühl
1 May 1923ErectedDiocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)
Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań
Apostolic Administration of Schneidemühl (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Schneidemühl
13 August 1930ElevatedApostolic Administration of Schneidemühl Territorial Prelature of Schneidemühl
28 June 1972SuppressedDiocese of Berlin
Territorial Prelature of Schneidemühl (suppressed)
Diocese of Gorzów (erected)
Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Schneidemühl
1950980,7131,178,57783.2%2141113253,017311242ap1951
1958500,000550,00090.9%1501002502,000100ap1971

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.6, 16 Apr 2021; Data: 30 Apr 2021

Quantcast