Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Territorial Prelature of Caravelí

Praelatura Territorialis Caraveliensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Territorial Prelature
  • Erected: 21 November 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 30,000 (11,587 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://prelaturacaraveli.blogspot.com/
  • Mailing Address: Prelatura, Jiron Ayacucho s/n, Caraveli, via Chala [Arequipa], Peru
  • Telephone: (054)51.12.20
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
21 November 1957ErectedDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga) (Part of Lucanas)
Archdiocese of Arequipa (La Unión, Condesuyos, and Caraveli)
Territorial Prelature of Caravelí (erected)
5 June 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Arequipa (Castilla and Camanŕ)
Territorial Prelature of Caravelí (Unión and Condesuyo)
Territorial Prelature of Chuquibamba (erected)
30 June 1966Metropolitan ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Caravelí (from Arequipa)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966161,000161,000100.0%913227,318132622ap1967
1970122,130122,130100.0%1011215,815124923ap1971
1976102,000105,00097.1%511166,375146922ap1977
1980112,000118,00094.9%411157,466133822ap1981
1990141,000148,00095.3%510159,400104122ap1991
1999160,000175,00091.4%34722,85765922ap2000
2000162,000178,00091.0%44820,25099322ap2001
2001105,000113,64092.4%57128,750115226ap2002
2002105,000115,00091.3%78157,00096522ap2003
2003105,000115,00091.3%77147,500119222ap2004
2004105,000115,00091.3%77147,500105222ap2005
2013117,712140,91283.5%95148,40895122ap2014
2016125,368144,17887.0%174215,96966122ap2017
2019133,470140,70094.9%154197,02455522ap2020
2021137,530145,00094.8%154197,23855723ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 50, Page 297, to Page 299
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 1,128, and Page 1,129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.8, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 3 Jul 2024