Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Zabarella

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1360Born
18 Jul 141049.9AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
15 Aug 141050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Firenze, Italy
16 Sep 141050.0ConfirmedBishop of Firenze, Italy
6 Jun 141150.8AppointedAdministrator of Firenze, Italy
6 Jun 141150.8Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jun 141150.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
16 Jun 141150.8ResignedAdministrator of Firenze, Italy
26 Sep 141757.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

MicroData Summary for Francesco Zabarella
Francesco Cardinal Zabarella (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiove di Sacco
Death PlaceConstance
Buried Place (Original)Constance
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
  • a cardinal for 6.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jun 1411
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast