Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard di Wippingen

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Dec 1301AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
30 Jul 1309AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
17 Mar 1325DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Gerhard di Wippingen
Bishop Gerhard di Wippingen (died ) Bishop of Basel

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 296, and Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast