Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberigo Visconti

Deceased

Bishop of Fermo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Apr 1295AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
28 Feb 1301AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
13 Jul 1314DiedBishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberigo Visconti
Bishop Alberigo Visconti (died ) Bishop of Fermo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 401, and Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Jun 2021

Quantcast