Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Louis-Toussaint Vion

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Poitiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1902Born
18 Jul 192624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Luçon, France
18 Aug 194846.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Poitiers, France
18 Aug 194846.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerara
9 Nov 194846.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerara
4 Aug 195654.2SucceededBishop of Poitiers, France
5 Jul 197573.1ResignedBishop of Poitiers, France
7 Jan 197774.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Louis-Toussaint Vion
Bishop Henri-Louis-Toussaint Vion (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa-Forêt-sur-Sèvre

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 123
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,037, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Sep 2021

Quantcast