Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Villars

Deceased

Bishop of Valence and Die, France

Administrator of Vienne


Events

DateEventTitle
5 May 1354AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
9 Jan 1363AppointedAdministrator of Vienne, France
3 Sep 1377DiedBishop of Valence and Die, France

MicroData Summary for Louis de Villars
Bishop Louis de Villars (died ) Bishop of Valence and Die

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 513, and Page 527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast