Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cyril Vasil’, S.J.

Bishop of Košice (Slovakian), Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1965 Born
14 Jun 198722.1Ordained PriestPriest of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian), Slovakia
15 Oct 199025.5EnteredPriest of Society of Jesus
2001²35.7Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
7 May 200944.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Libya
7 May 200944.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
14 Jun 200944.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Libya
20 Jan 202054.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Košice (Slovakian), Slovakia
24 Jun 202156.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Košice (Slovakian), Slovakia
4 Jul 202156.2InstalledBishop of Košice (Slovakian), Slovakia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cyril Vasil’
Archbishop Cyril Vasil’ S.J. (born ) Bishop of Košice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKošice
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Eparchy of Košice (Slovakian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 May 2009
  • c1+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,187
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2021
  • i: CB, 2 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jul 2021

Quantcast