Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonio José Valín Valdés

Bishop-Elect of Tui-Vigo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1968 Born
14 Feb 199324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
Nov 2020²52.6AppointedAdministrator of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
4 Sep 202153.5CeasedAdministrator of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
25 May 202456.2AppointedBishop of Tui-Vigo, Spain
20 Jul 202456.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tui-Vigo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio José Valín Valdés
(WikiData: Q126095916)
Father Antonio José Valín Valdés (born ) Bishop-Elect of Tui-Vigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRibadeo, Diocese of Mondoñedo-Ferrol
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tui, Diocese of Tui-Vigo

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Tui-Vigo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 May 2024
  • ob: CB, 25 May 2024
  • c2+: CB, 16 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 16 Jul 2024