Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo de Valbuena y Villanueva

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1568Born
14 Dec 162052.0AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
27 Jan 162253.1Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
11 Oct 162758.8DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Valbuena y Villanueva
Bishop Bernardo de Valbuena y Villanueva (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValdepeñas, Spain
Ordained BishopSanto Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,966
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 286
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 141, Number 899
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 49
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,189
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,937

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast