Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ugo , O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
1306AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
26 Feb 1306AppointedAdministrator of Oristano, Italy
21 Jul 1307AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
19 Mar 1308AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pula (Pola), Croatia

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ugo
Archbishop Ugo O.P. , Bishop of Pula (Pola)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 404, and Page 101
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Jun 2021

Quantcast