Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alfonso Tscherrig, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Reyes, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Nephelis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1903Born
8 Sep 192319.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Sep 192824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
11 Dec 195653.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia
11 Dec 195653.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nephelis
30 May 195753.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nephelis
11 Dec 197067.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Reyes, Bolivia
22 Nov 198279.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Reyes, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for José Alfonso Tscherrig
Bishop José Alfonso Tscherrig C.SS.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Reyes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrieg, Switzerland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sion, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2++: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 699

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast