Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabian Toppo

Bishop of Jalpaiguri, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1960 Born
3 Dec 199433.9Ordained PriestPriest of Jalpaiguri, India
8 Feb 202564.1AppointedBishop of Jalpaiguri, India
1 May 202564.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jalpaiguri, India

MicroData Summary
Fabian Toppo
Bishop Fabian Toppo
(born )
Bishop of Jalpaiguri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDarupisa, Diocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur
Ordained BishopChrist the Redeemer, Cathedral, Jalpaiguri, Diocese of Jalpaiguri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jalpaiguri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2025
  • c2+: CB, 1 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 1 May 2025