Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Paula Suárez Peredo y Bezares

Deceased

Bishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1823Born
25 May 184723.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
18 Mar 184824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
19 Mar 186339.5AppointedBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
8 May 186440.6Ordained BishopBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
18 Sep 186441.0InstalledBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
26 Jan 187046.3DiedBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Suárez Peredo y Bezares
Bishop Francisco de Paula Suárez Peredo y Bezares (born , died ) Bishop of Veracruz-Jalapa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Puebla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 21.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 586
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast