Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dino Cardinal Staffa

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1906Born
25 May 192922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Imola, Italy
18 Dec 195852.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities
3 Sep 196054.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
28 Oct 196054.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
7 Apr 196760.6AppointedPro-Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura
26 Jun 196760.8Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jun 196760.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sacro Cuore di Cristo Re
26 Mar 196962.6AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
24 May 197669.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
7 Aug 197770.9DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Dino Staffa (VIAF: 89095700)
Dino Cardinal Staffa (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria in Fabriago, Diocese of Imola, Italy
Ordained PriestImola, Diocese of Imola, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Cemetery, Massa Lombarda, Diocese of Imola, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Gabriele Arcangelo, Church, Lugo di Romagna, Diocese of Imola, Italy

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1960, Number 108
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Jun 1967

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast