Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Reinaldo Sorto Martínez

Bishop-Elect of El Salvador, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1961 Born
19 May 199433.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Salvador, El Salvador
13 Jun 202463.2AppointedBishop of El Salvador, Military
20 Jul 202463.3Ordained BishopBishop of El Salvador, Military
21 Jul 202463.3InstalledBishop of El Salvador, Military

MicroData Summary for Reinaldo Sorto Martínez
(WikiData: Q126595824)
Father Reinaldo Sorto Martínez (born ) Bishop-Elect of El Salvador, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZacatecoluca, Diocese of San Vicente
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Salvador, Archdiocese of San Salvador

Please contact the Father through the Military Ordinariate of El Salvador, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2024
  • ob/i: CB, 13 Jun 2024
  • c2: CB, 11 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 12 Jul 2024