Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Soldani

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹Born
1 Sep 167040.6AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
7 Sep 167040.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
13 Aug 167444.6DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Soldani
Bishop Filippo Soldani (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Fiesole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopS. Marcel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast