Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cornelius Cardinal Sim

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Brunei

Cardinal-Priest of San Giuda Taddeo Apostolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1951Born
26 Nov 198938.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 199746.1AppointedPrefect of Brunei
22 Feb 199846.4InstalledPrefect of Brunei
20 Oct 200453.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Brunei
20 Oct 200453.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Putia in Numidia
21 Jan 200553.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Putia in Numidia
28 Nov 202069.1Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 202069.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giuda Taddeo Apostolo
29 May 202169.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Brunei

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Sim
Cornelius Cardinal Sim (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Brunei

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeria
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Assumption, Church, Bandar Seri Begawan
Death PlaceChang Gung Memorial, Hospital, Taoyuan, Taiwan

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
  • a cardinal for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,809
  • card: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • cpri: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020
  • d: CB, 29 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 May 2021

Quantcast