Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Selim Jean Sfeir

Archbishop-Elect of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1958 Born
22 May 198829.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sarba (Maronite), Lebanon
Oct 2020³62.0AppointedPatriarchal Administrator of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
16 Jun 202162.7SelectedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
19 Jun 202162.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
29 Jul 202162.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Selim Jean Sfeir
Father Selim Jean Sfeir (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Cipro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRayfoun (Keserwan District), Lebanon
Ordained BishopAchkout, Eparchy of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Cipro (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2021
  • ob/c12: CB, 19 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Jun 2021

Quantcast