Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosio María Serrano y Rodriguez

Deceased

Bishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1817Born
19 Mar 186345.2AppointedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
8 May 186446.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
8 Feb 187557.1DiedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Ambrosio María Serrano y Rodriguez
Bishop Ambrosio María Serrano y Rodriguez (born , died ) Bishop of Chilapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChilapa, Diocese of Chilapa, Guerrero
Ordained BishopCathedral, Puebla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 202
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast