Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Abilio Sebastiani Aguirre, S.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1935Born
24 Sep 195823.5Solemn VowsMember of Society of Mary
23 Apr 196227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
21 Nov 199257.7AppointedBishop of Tarma, Peru
3 Jan 199357.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarma, Peru
13 Jun 200166.3AppointedArchbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
6 Aug 201176.4RetiredArchbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
10 Aug 202085.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru

MicroData Summary for Luis Abilio Sebastiani Aguirre
Archbishop Luis Abilio Sebastiani Aguirre S.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Callao
Ordained BishopSte Anne, Cathedral, Tarma, Diocese of Tarma
Death PlaceClinica Stella Maris, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, El Callao

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,994
  • d/sole: CB, 11 Aug 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 May 2021

Quantcast