Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas Sawaf

Archbishop Emeritus of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1943 Born
15 Apr 196825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
14 Jan 200056.9AppointedArchbishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
4 Mar 200057.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
Aug 2021³78.4RetiredArchbishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Sawaf
Archbishop Nicolas Sawaf (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lattaquié {Laodicea}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep, Archdiocese of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Alep, Archdiocese of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,706
  • opd/c1: CB, 17 Jul 2017
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Aug 2021

Quantcast