Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Savelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bologna, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Nov 1295AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
8 Apr 1296Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
10 Jan 1299AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
10 Jan 1299AppointedAdministrator of Padova {Padua}, Italy
Feb 1299³ResignedAdministrator of Padova {Padua}, Italy
7 Jul 1302DiedBishop of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Savelli
Bishop Giovanni Savelli O.P. (died ) Bishop of Bologna

  • a bishop for 6.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 385, and Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jul 2021

Quantcast