Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Sangallo (de Podio), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1410AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
9 Mar 1418AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
23 Dec 1429AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
1453¹DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sangallo (de Podio)
Archbishop Antonio Sangallo (de Podio) O.F.M. (died 1453) Archbishop of Santa Severina

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 465, and Page 449
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 May 2021

Quantcast