Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel Román Idígoras

Bishop of Albacete, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1968 Born
16 May 199324.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Alcalá de Henares, Spain
24 Apr 199425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Alcalá de Henares, Spain
6 Mar 202556.6AppointedBishop of Albacete, Spain
3 May 202556.8Ordained BishopBishop of Albacete, Spain

MicroData Summary
Ángel Román Idígoras
Bishop Ángel Román Idígoras
(born )
Bishop of Albacete

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Madrid
Ordained PriestSantos Niños Justo y Pastor, Cathedral, Alcalá de Henares, Diocese of Alcalá de Henares
Ordained BishopSan Juan Bautista, Cathedral, Albacete, Diocese of Albacete

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Albacete.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2025
  • od/ob: CB, 6 Mar 2025
  • c2+: CB, 30 Apr 2025
  • c2+: CB, 3 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 3 May 2025