Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Rioja, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1936Born
31 Jan 197033.4Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
12 Nov 199256.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
12 Nov 199256.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pertusa
22 Dec 199256.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pertusa
23 Jun 199861.8AppointedBishop of Villa María, Argentina
13 Sep 199862.0InstalledBishop of Villa María, Argentina
24 May 200669.7AppointedBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
23 Jul 200669.9InstalledBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
9 Jul 201376.9RetiredBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
3 Jul 202184.8DiedBishop Emeritus of La Rioja, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Roberto Rodríguez
Bishop Roberto Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Rioja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTemperley
Ordained PriestCosquín, Archdiocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopStade "Corazon de Maria", Córdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba
Death PlaceJesús María, Archdiocese of Córdoba

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,054
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2013
  • d/c1: CB, 3 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jul 2021

Quantcast