Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Riquer y Bastero, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1380AppointedBishop of Monreale, Italy
19 Dec 1384AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
9 Sep 1393AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
1400²AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain
1409¹DiedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Riquer y Bastero
Bishop Francisco Riquer y Bastero O.F.M. (died 1409) Bishop of Segorbe-Albarracin

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 379, and Page 526
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 443, and Page 349

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Apr 2021

Quantcast