Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles Reithinger, M.E.P.

Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

Titular Bishop of Saint-Papoul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1972 Born
21 Jun 199825.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Strasbourg, France
27 Jun 199926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
12 Jul 201744.6AppointedSuperior General of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 Jun 202148.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
26 Jun 202148.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Saint-Papoul
4 Jul 202148.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saint-Papoul

MicroData Summary for Gilles Reithinger
Bishop Gilles Reithinger M.E.P. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMulhouse, Archdiocese of Strasbourg
Ordained DeaconSaint-François-Xavier, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopCathedral, Strasbourg, Archdiocese of Strasbourg

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Strasbourg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jul 2021

Quantcast