Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Radicioni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1906Born
1 May 192922.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 195145.0AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
10 Dec 195145.0AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
27 Jan 195245.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
7 Apr 198376.3RetiredBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
7 Apr 198376.3RetiredBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
15 Nov 198881.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Radicioni
Bishop Vincenzo Radicioni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNumana

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast