Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nikólaos Printezis

Archbishop Emeritus of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1941 Born
19 Dec 196524.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 199352.1AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece
29 Apr 199352.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chios (Scio), Greece
4 Jul 199352.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece
25 Jan 202179.9RetiredArchbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece
25 Jan 202179.9RetiredApostolic Administrator of Chios (Scio), Greece

MicroData Summary for Nikólaos Printezis
Archbishop Nikólaos Printezis (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVari
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame du Rosaire, Cathedral, Xynara, Tinos, Archdiocese of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,164
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Jul 2021

Quantcast