Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio da Ponte

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Apr 1391AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
27 Feb 1402AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
26 Jun 1409AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
10 Jul 1419AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Antonio da Ponte
Bishop Antonio da Ponte , Bishop of Albenga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 449, and Page 201
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 99, and Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast