Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Poitiers

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
11 May 1349AppointedBishop of Gap, France
13 Mar 1353AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
25 Aug 1370DiedBishop of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de Poitiers
Bishop Henri de Poitiers (died ) Bishop of Troyes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 494, and Page 514

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Feb 2021

Quantcast