Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro (de Pino)

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 May 1348AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
6 Jun 1348Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
15 Jul 1348AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
27 Jul 1349AppointedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

MicroData Summary for Pietro (de Pino)
Bishop Pietro (de Pino) , Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 398, and Page 523
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 532

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast