Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leonardo Cardinal Patrasso

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1230¹Born
16 Sep 129060.7AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
24 Mar 129565.2AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
1297²67.0AppointedAdministrator of Ostia (e Velletri)
17 Jun 129767.4AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
1299²69.0CeasedAdministrator of Ostia (e Velletri)
20 Jul 129969.5AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
2 Mar 130070.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
2 Mar 130070.1Elevated to Cardinal
7 Dec 131181.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Patrasso
Leonardo Cardinal Patrasso (born 1230, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlatri

  • a cardinal for 11.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Mar 1300
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 351, and Page 79
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 123, and Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Aug 2021

Quantcast